IL HB5398 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1266
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1266
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Changes the composition of the veterans advisory council from 17 to 21 by adding one person appointed by the Adjutant General of the Illinois National Guard, one person appointed by the Illinois Attorney General, one person appointed by the Illinois Secretary of State, and one person appointed by the Director of the Illinois Department of Employment Security. Provides that one veteran or family member of a veteran (rather than one veteran) appointed by the commander or president of each veterans service organization or military family organization (rather than only each veterans service organization) that is chartered by the federal government and by the State of Illinois and elects to appoint a member shall sit on the council. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS ADVISORY COUNCIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-26 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1266 | |
2010-07-26 | Effective Date July 26, 2010 | |
2010-07-26 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 015-000-000 | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Veterans' Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |