IL HB5373 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that decisions regarding the treatment of patients experiencing chronic pain shall be made by the prescriber with dispensing by the pharmacist in accordance with the corresponding responsibility as described in federal regulations and State administrative rules. Provides that ordering, prescribing, dispensing, administering, or paying for controlled substances, including opioids, shall not be predetermined by specific morphine milligram equivalent guidelines. Provides that confidential information received from opioid treatment programs or confidential information otherwise protected under federal confidentiality of substance use disorder patient records shall not be included in the information shared to the central repository under the Prescription Monitoring Program. Provides that an applicant for this information must have a valid court order or subpoena for the confidential information requested. Defines "chronic pain" and "opiates". Effective immediately.
Title
CONT SUB-CHRONIC PAIN TREATMEN
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Hoan Huynh [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 315.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 570 | 318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |