IL HB5369 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that bids for State or federally funded road construction contracts shall include transportation costs itemized apart from the cost of the goods or materials transported.
Title
ROAD CONSTRUCTION BIDS
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | To Transportation: Registration and Regulations Subcommittee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |