IL HB5346 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $10,000,000 to the Illinois State Board of Education for after-school art programs and $10,000,000 to the Illinois Arts Council for community art programs. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$ART PROGRAMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback