IL HB5340 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Pharmaceutical Collaborative Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to convene the Illinois Pharmaceutical Collaborative (Collaborative) to address the rising cost of pharmaceutical drugs. Provides that the Collaborative shall be chaired by the Director of Healthcare and Family Services and its activities shall be coordinated by the Department. Provides that the Collaborative shall meet twice a year and that its mission shall be to coordinate the efforts of State and local government entities to identify and implement opportunities for cost savings with regard to the purchase of pharmaceuticals, particularly pharmaceuticals that are considered high-cost drugs. Contains provisions concerning the composition and duties of the Collaborative; Department contracts with manufacturers and suppliers of single source or multisource pharmaceuticals; the appointment of a pharmaceutical benefits manager; State participation in a prescription drug bulk purchasing program; and reporting requirements.
Title
DHFS-PHARMACEUTICAL COLLAB ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5340&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5340.htm |