IL HB5340 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the License to Work Act. Deletes language providing that all notices sent to a person involved in administrative adjudications, hearings, and final orders shall state that failure to satisfy any fine or penalty shall result in the Secretary of State suspending his or her driving privileges, vehicle registration, or both. Deletes language providing that the Secretary is authorized to cancel a license or permit for failure to pay any fines, civil penalties owed to the Illinois Commerce Commission, or taxes or being a convicted sex offender. Provides that a person whose driver's license was cancelled due to a sex offense conviction shall have his or her driver's license reinstated. Deletes language providing that the reporting requirements for public officials to the Secretary shall apply to a truant minor in need of supervision, an addicted minor, or a delinquent minor whose driver's license has been suspended. Deletes language providing that the Secretary is authorized to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of a person without preliminary hearing for specific adjudications or violations. Provides that the Secretary is authorized to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of a person for specific violations. Provides that a person whose driver's license was suspended or revoked under certain circumstances shall have his or her driving privileges reinstated. Deletes language providing that the owner of a registered vehicle that has failed to pay any fine or penalty due and owing as a result of 10 or more violations shall have his or her driving privileges suspended. Repeals provisions providing the suspension of a driver's license of a person convicted of theft of motor fuel and suspension of driving privileges for failure to satisfy fines or penalties for toll violations or evasions. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-LICENSE-SUSPENSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-01 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e). |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-704.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-209.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-213 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |