IL HB5340 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Denies home rule powers to require firearm training and instruction or to otherwise regulate the ownership or possession of firearms. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS-PREEMPT LOC GOV
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-001-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |