IL HB5328 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the revised School Improvement Plan for a school that is initially placed on academic watch status after a fourth annual calculation or that remains on academic watch status after a fifth annual calculation to be approved by the school board and by the school's local school council, if applicable. Provides that a charter school operating within the City of Chicago shall be administered by a local school council. Provides that a local school council shall be established for each attendance center within the Chicago Public School district. Provides that in each attendance center enrolling students in 7th or 8th grade, one full-time student member shall be appointed, although no attendance center shall have more than one student member. Requires a supermajority of 8 votes by the local school council to veto any action proposed or approved regarding certain schools placed on probation and intervention actions by the Chicago Schools Academic Accountability Council. Provides that the board of education shall provide $2,500 annually to each local school council for the purposes of training and to procure reasonable and necessary office equipment and supplies as each local school council sees fit. Creates the LSC Certification Commission to provide fundamental training to members of local school councils and certify each member and sets forth its composition. Sets forth a mandatory training program for local school council members. Provides that the LSC Certification Commission may request and, upon such request, the board of education shall budget and distribute such funds as are equal to the total allocations for the certification of local school council members in the year immediately prior. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-LOCAL SCHOOL COUNCILS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2014-07-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2014-04-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2014-04-11HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2014-04-09HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2014-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2014-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
2014-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2014-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2014-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2014-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2014-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2014-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2014-03-06HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2014-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith
2014-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2014-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2014-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25dAmended CodeCitation Text
105527A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-2.2Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-2.3bAmended CodeCitation Text
105534-2.4bAmended CodeCitation Text
105534-8.3Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-8.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback