IL HB5310 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to award grants to local business groups to address and study small business concerns related to a change in the minimum wage. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-MINIMUM WAGE STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |