IL HB5309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the State Agency and Grantee Bonus Prohibition Act. Provides that no State agency may pay a bonus to its employees. Provides that no entity receiving State grant funds may pay a bonus from grant funds awarded for operational expenses to its employees. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE AGENCY BONUS PROHIBITION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateTo Subcommittee on Compensation and Benefits
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-045-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 004-002-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback