IL HB5308 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not require any person committed to the custody of the Department of Corrections who is eligible for medical assistance to pay a fee as a co-payment for services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-INMATES-NO CO-PAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-002-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-030-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-4.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback