IL HB5297 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, for the 2-year period consisting of taxable years 2010 and 2011, the city council or the board of trustees of the municipality shall annually levy a tax upon all the taxable property of the municipality at the rate on the dollar that will produce an amount for that 2-year period that is the lesser of: (i) the amount levied for taxable year 2009 multiplied by 1.1 or (ii) an amount that, when added to the deductions from the salaries or wages of police officers and firefighters and revenues available from other sources, will equal a sum sufficient to meet the annual actuarial requirements of the pension funds. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 3&4-FINANCING-LEVY
Sponsors
Rep. Karen May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5297&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5297.htm |