IL HB5290 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - Third Reading - Lost; 029-021-006
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - Third Reading - Lost; 029-021-006
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code in provisions concerning bullying prevention. Makes changes concerning the legislative findings. Provides that, on or before January 1, 2013, the State Board of Education shall develop a template for a model bullying prevention policy and sets forth requirements concerning the template. Sets forth and changes requirements, beginning with the 2013-2014 school year, for each school district and non-public, non-sectarian elementary or secondary school, as well as the State Board, concerning policies on bullying. Sets forth provisions concerning the collection, maintenance, and submission of data regarding allegations and incidences of bullying and rules. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-BULLYING POLICY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 029-021-006 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 23, 2012 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2012 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 006-004-000 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-04-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-049-002 |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-005-000 |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-009-000 |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-02-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-02-29 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-23.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |