IL HB5285 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, except in the definition of "conviction" in the Criminal Code of 2012, restores a provision that "conviction" means a judgment of conviction or sentence (rather than a judgment of conviction and sentence) entered upon a plea of guilty or upon a verdict or finding of guilty of an offense, rendered by a legally constituted jury or by a court of competent jurisdiction authorized to try the case without a jury. In that definition, provides that if judgment is withheld, the plea, verdict, or finding of guilty is not a conviction under Illinois law unless and until judgment is entered.
Title
PROBATION-CONVICTION-JUDGMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 646 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |