IL HB5271 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for its FY23 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$DHS-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |