IL HB5252 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to, at least annually, provide each provider of home and community-based services an updated, detailed rate sheet for each funded client served by the provider. Provides that the Department must also, within 45 days of submission of any provider-based information to the Department, such as Inventory for Client and Agency Planning scores, which changes a client's reimbursement rate, issue an updated rate sheet for the client. Provides that each detailed rate sheet must include full rate calculator formula transparency.
Title
DHS-DD SERVICES-RATE SHEET
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Chung [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5252&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5252.htm |