IL HB5247 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that quick-take powers may be used for a period of no more than 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act by the City of Elmhurst for the acquisition of certain described property for the purpose of road construction. Repeals the new provisions 3 years after the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
QUICK-TAKE-CITY OF ELMHURST
Sponsors
Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass [D] | Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0698 |
2024-07-19 | House | Effective Date July 19, 2024 |
2024-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-011-000 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-027-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |