IL HB5231 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-03 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-03 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Law Enforcement Support Program Confidentiality Act. Provides that information, omissions, confessions, or other communication obtained by a participant in a peer support program involving a peer support counselor from a law enforcement officer, public safety employee, peace officer, firefighter, or emergency services personnel shall be considered confidential information and shall not be released to any person or entity, including, but not limited to, a court, administrative agency or tribunal, or public officer or employer, unless: (1) to the extent it appears necessary to prevent the commission of an act that is likely to result in a clear imminent risk of serious physical injury or death of a person or persons; (2) when required by court order; or (3) when, after full disclosure has been provided, the person who made the confession, admission, or other communication has given specific written consent. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a provision permitting the Department of State Police to deny an application for or to revoke and seize a Firearm Owner's Identification Card of a person who has been a patient of a mental health facility within the past 5 years is not applicable to an active law enforcement officer employed by a unit of government, unless the Department receives an affirmative statement by a treating clinical psychologist or physician that the law enforcement officer is a threat to himself or herself, another person, or the public. Effective immediately.
Title
ENFORCEMENT CONFIDENTIALITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0911 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 108-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2018-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee; |
2018-04-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-09 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |