IL HB5220 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Reduces the hours or credit hours required of education or training for various licenses under the Act. Makes conforming changes.
Title
BARBER/COSMETOLOGY-EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 410 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 2-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3C-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3C-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3C-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3E-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3E-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |