IL HB5211 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Professional Service Corporation Act. Provides that the certificate of registration shall expire on January 1, 2019, and on January 1 of every third year thereafter, for any professional service corporation that renders services that are regulated by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Establishes a renewal fee of $40 for a certificate of registration issued by the Department. Makes similar changes to the Medical Corporation Act. Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Defines "professional limited liability company". Removes provisions prohibiting a limited liability company from rendering certain professional services, and instead provides that a limited liability company that intends to provide a professional service licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation must be formed in compliance with the Professional Limited Liability Company Act. Amends the Professional Limited Liability Company Act. Defines "license". Provides that one or more individuals may organize a professional limited liability company by filing articles of organization with the Secretary of State on forms furnished by the Secretary. Sets forth certain requirements the articles of organization must satisfy. Provides that the company name of a professional limited liability company must contain the terms "professional limited liability company", "P.L.L.C.", or "PLLC". Lists the professional services a professional limited liability company may render, with certain exceptions. Provides that a professional limited liability company's certificate of registration shall expire on January 1, 2019 and on January 1 of every third year thereafter; and that the renewal fee for a certificate of registration shall be $40 (rather than calculated at the rate of $40 per year). Effective immediately.
Title
DFPR-PROFESSIONAL SERVICES-LLC
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-19 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 10 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 15 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 1-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 185 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
805 | 185 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
805 | 185 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
805 | 185 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 185 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
805 | 185 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |