IL HB5210 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Requires a sponsoring broker that maintains more than one office within the State to notify the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation on forms prescribed by the Department (rather than apply for a branch office license) for each office other than the sponsoring broker's principal place of business. Requires the brokerage license (rather than the branch office license) to be displayed conspicuously in each branch office. Removes a reference to "education provider branches". Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

: REAL ESTATE-BRANCH OFFICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-02SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-001-002
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22545430-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback