IL HB5201 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Establishes a cannabis tracking program coordinated and administered by the Illinois State Police to track purchases of cannabis across multiple locations by any person or entity licensed under the Act. Provides that each time an adult use dispensing organization distributes cannabis to an adult use purchaser, the adult use dispensing organization shall transmit an electronic transaction record to a Central Repository. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to notify persons or entities seeking licensure under the Act of their obligation to comply with the requirements. Provides that funding for the tracking program shall be provided by the Illinois State Police, drawing upon State grant money and other available sources. Requires the Illinois State Police to establish a secure website for the transmission of electronic transaction records. Contains provisions regarding the confidentiality of records. Provides specified criminal offenses and fines for violations. Preempts home rule. Contains other provisions.
Title
CANNABIS-TRACKING PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 705 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 55-23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5201&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5201.htm |