IL HB5200 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a Youth Training in the Construction Trades Program to award grants to community-based organizations for the purpose of establishing training programs for youth with an interest in the construction trades, electrical trade, or plumbing trade. Provides that under the training programs, youth shall receive formal training and education in the fundamentals and core competencies in their chosen trade and shall receive hands-on experience to further develop their skills by participating in community improvement projects involving the rehabilitation of vacant and abandoned residential housing in economically depressed areas of the State. Requires selected organizations to also use the grant money to establish an entrepreneurship program to provide youth with the capital and business management skills necessary to successfully launch their own business in their particular trade. Contains provisions concerning selection criteria and the Youth Training in the Construction Trades Fund. Amends the Illinois Housing Development Act. Requires the Illinois Housing Development Authority to establish a Training Youth in the Construction Trades Program that is substantially similar to the Youth Training in the Construction Trades Program. Contains provisions on selection criteria and the Training Youth in the Construction Trades Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Youth Training and Education in the Construction Trades Program Fund and the Training Youth in the Construction Trades Fund. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
DHS-IHDA-YOUTH-TRADE PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 10-48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3805 | 7.32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.886 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.887 | New Code | See Bill Text |