IL HB5190 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0853
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0853
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that the allocation to road districts shall be made in the same manner and be subject to the same conditions and qualifications as are provided by Section 8 of the Motor Vehicle Tax Law with respect to the allocation to road districts of the amount allotted from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund for apportionment to counties for the use of road districts, but no allocation shall be made to any road district that has not levied taxes for road and bridge purposes in such a manner that is eligible for allotment of Motor Fuel Tax funding pursuant to the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that any funds allocated to a county that are not obligated within 48 months shall be considered lapsed funds and reappropriated in the same fund. Provides that the lapsed funds shall be used to provide additional monetary assistance to townships and road districts that have insufficient funding for construction of bridges that are 20 feet or more in length under the Code. Requires the Department of Transportation to adopt rules to implement the provisions.
Title
HWY CD-LAPSED FUNDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0853 |
2024-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2024 |
2024-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-25 | House | House Concurs |
2024-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000 |
2024-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2024-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2024-03-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 6-901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-905 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-906 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-907 | New Code | See Bill Text |