IL HB5190 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $15,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the African-American and Latinx HIV/AIDS Response Fund. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
$GRF-HIV/AIDS RESPONSE FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5190&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB5190.pdf |