IL HB5184 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Further amends the Counties Code. In a provision permitting a county with a Veterans Assistance Commission to impose a tax on all taxable property for the purpose of providing assistance to military veterans and their families, provides that the tax shall be separate from all other taxes which the county is authorized to levy. Provides that in counties where a Veterans Assistance Commission has been properly created, those County Veterans Assistance Commissions shall be in charge of the administration of the assistance provided under certain provisions of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Further amends the Military Veterans Assistance Act. Makes changes to the definition of "veteran service organization". Provides that it shall be the duty of the commander, quartermaster, or commandant (rather than the commander) of each veteran service organization to send the commander, quartermaster, or commandant (rather than the commander) of every other organization a written list of the names of all persons to whom assistance has been granted during the preceding month. Provides that in a county having 2 or more veteran service organizations, the Veterans Assistance Commission of such county may (rather than shall) act as the central service office for all veterans and their families and for the families of deceased veterans. Makes other changes.
Title
VETERANS ASSISTANCE COMM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0732 |
2022-05-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-21.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-21.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 2-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 45 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-2006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |