IL HB5182 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Creates a third-party retailer delivery license. Provides that a third-party retailer delivery license shall authorize a person who is not licensed to sell alcoholic liquor to deliver alcoholic liquor on behalf of a retailer licensee and to deliver alcoholic liquor on behalf of or at the request of an unlicensed purchaser of alcoholic liquor from a retailer licensee. Provides that a third-party retailer delivery license is not required for an employee or independent contractor of a person holding a third-party retailer delivery license or for an employee of a retailer licensee who is not an independent contractor of a retailer licensee. Provides that the issuance and regulation of a third-party retailer delivery license is under the exclusive jurisdiction of the Illinois Liquor Control Commission and does not require local approval prior to issuance by the State Commission. Preempts home rule powers. Sets forth fees for licensure and requirements for the delivery of alcoholic liquor by third-party retailer delivery licensees, including limitations on fees that may be charged, maintenance of an insurance policy, recordkeeping, labeling of alcoholic liquor, and verification that the recipient is 21 years of age or older. In a provision requiring alcohol servers to complete responsible alcohol service server training, adds a person who delivers alcoholic liquor on behalf of a third-party retailer delivery licensee to the definition of "alcohol server". Makes changes in provisions authorizing the delivery and carry out of mixed drinks. In a provision concerning prohibited possession and delivery of alcoholic liquor, removes an exemption from the provisions for persons under the age of 21 making a delivery of an alcoholic beverage in pursuance of his or her employment.
Title
LIQUOR-THIRD-PARTY DELIVERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-27.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-28.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
235 | 5 | 6-28.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-28.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5182&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5182.htm |