IL HB5147 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Athletic Trainers Practice Act, the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act, the Dietitian Nutritionist Practice Act, the Massage Licensing Act, the Illinois Occupational Therapy Practice Act, the Pharmacy Practice Act, the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004, the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985, and the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. Provides the maximum fees for original licensure and renewal of licensure for professions licensed under the Acts. Provides that the total fees required by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to enter a profession shall not exceed double the original license fee.
Title
DFPR LICENSE FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | To Occupational Licenses Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 115 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 30 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 4-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 447 | 50-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 5 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 75 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |