IL HB5145 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0991
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0991
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abandoned Mined Lands and Water Reclamation Act. Prohibits annual expenditures for non-coal reclamation from exceeding 2% of the Department of Natural Resources' annual budget for mine reclamation. Effective immediately.
Title
NON-COAL MINE-RECLAMATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0991 |
2012-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1920 | 2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |