IL HB5137 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Foster Child Identification Theft Protection Act. Provides that every Department of Children and Family Services caseworker shall annually request from a credit reporting agency a credit report on each child who is in foster care and assigned to the caseworker as a client. Provides that if a credit report indicates unauthorized credit-related activity in a child's name, the caseworker shall notify the credit reporting agency and request that the agency correct the child's credit record to expunge all references to the unauthorized credit-related activity or take other action that will expressly and clearly indicate that the activity was unauthorized. Provides that a caseworker shall also report such unauthorized credit-related activity to the State's Attorney. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to develop standard forms for use by caseworkers in connection with these provisions.
Title
FOSTER CHILD ID THEFT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading | |
2010-01-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5137&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5137.htm |