IL HB5136 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the development of teacher evaluation plans, provides that, beginning with the first school year following the effective date of the amendatory Act, a joint committee (created by a school district to incorporate the use of data and indicators on student growth as a significant factor in rating teacher performance into the evaluation plan) shall meet no less than one time annually to assess and review the effectiveness of the district's evaluation plan for the purposes of continuous improvement of instruction and evaluation practices.
Title
SCD CD-TEACHER EVALUATION PLAN
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0768 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 076-016-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-003-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-003-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 064-049-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |