IL HB5130 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that when the Department of Public Health receives a complaint of a violation of the Act or the Department's rules, the Department shall require (instead of request) information identifying the complainant, and requires that the identifying information include the complainant's relationship to the facility. Provides that if the Department has a good faith belief, based on information that comes to its attention, that a complaint is frivolous, intended to harass, or intended to defraud the Department, the Department shall (i) impose on the complainant a civil monetary penalty in the amount of $125 and (ii) include the complainant's name on a list of violators published quarterly. Also provides that if the complainant is licensed or certified by the Department or by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, then, subject to the requirements of the Department's Health Care Worker Registry, the Department shall forward the complainant's name to the appropriate agency for further action. Effective January 1, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURSING HOMES-COMPLAINTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-03-09HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2012-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2012-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Unes
2012-02-27HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2012-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon
2012-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
2012-02-08HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Unes
2012-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210453-702Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback