IL HB5127 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the written notice for an alleged instance of a vehicle's operation on a toll highway without the required toll having been paid must be provided by the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority within 7 days of the alleged violation. Provides that a fine for an alleged instance of a vehicle's operation on a toll highway without the required toll having been paid shall not be imposed until 14 days after the alleged violation and shall not exceed $10 per violation. Provides that if the imposed fine is not paid within 30 days of receipt of the written notice, an additional $25 shall be imposed per violation. Effective immediately.
Title
TOLL HWY-FINES-NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5127&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5127.htm |