IL HB5125 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that theft of property that is delivered either by United States mail or an express company, common carrier, or contract carrier and left on the stoop or porch of a residence is a Class 4 felony. Defines "stoop or porch of a residence".
Title
CRIM CD-THEFT-PACKAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-03-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5125&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5125.htm |