IL HB5121 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-4)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-4)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Intergovernmental Cooperation Act. Provides that no intergovernmental or interagency agreement or contract may be entered into, implemented, or given effect if the agreement's or contract's intent or effect is, among other requirements, to circumvent any limitation established by law pertaining to payroll certification under the State Finance Act or to authorize the payment of employees of the Office of the Governor out of appropriations other than those established for that purpose. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that, for the Office of the Governor, the certification on every State payroll voucher shall be required for expenditures from amounts appropriated to the Office of the Governor for payment of salaries of Governor's Office employees and executed by the Governor, or his or her designee, in addition to any other certifications or approvals which may be required by law to be made. Provides that in no event shall salaries of employees of the Office of the Governor be paid from appropriations other than those established for that purpose. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPTROLLER-PAYROLL CERTIFY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0655 |
2018-07-31 | House | Effective Date July 31, 2018 |
2018-07-31 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-007-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-03-08 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 9.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 220 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |