IL HB5119 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the foster care expenses, not to exceed $1,000 in any taxable year, paid or incurred by the taxpayer with respect to a qualified dependent child. Provides that the credit may be prorated. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ADOPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darren Bailey |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5119&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5119.htm |