IL HB5119 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Administrative Review Law of the Code of Civil Procedure. In the definition of "administrative decision", changes references to "parties" to "persons". Provides that administrative decisions made reviewable by statute and final administrative decisions for which there is no other adequate remedy in a court are subject to judicial review. Provides that a person suffering legal wrong because of an administrative decision, or adversely affected or aggrieved by an administrative decision, is entitled to judicial review of the administrative decision. Provides that the Administrative Review Law shall apply to and govern every action to review judicially a final decision of any administrative agency unless the action is governed by the procedures or provisions of another statute. Strikes language concerning the scope of the Administrative Review Law. Provides that every action to review a final administrative decision shall be commenced by the filing of a complaint and the issuance of summons within 60 (instead of 35) days from the date that a copy of the decision sought to be reviewed was served upon the party affected by the decision. Makes other changes in Sections concerning commencement of action; defendants; scope of review; powers of the circuit court; and direct review of administrative orders by the appellate court. Effective immediately.
Title
ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-07 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 3-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 3-101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 3-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 3-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 3-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 3-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 3-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 3-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5119&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5119.htm |