IL HB5111 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Behavioral Health Workforce Act. Creates the Behavioral Health Education Center, administered by a teaching or research State university, or both. Provides that the Center shall be operational on or before July 1, 2019. Provides that the Center shall: (1) provide funds for 2 additional medical residents in a State-based psychiatry program each year beginning July 1, 2019 until a total of 8 additional psychiatry residents are added in 2022; (2) provide funds for 5 one-year doctoral-level psychology internships, master social workers, and master level clinical professional counselors in this State within 12 months after the effective date of this Act and every year thereafter and increase the number of interns in the program to 10 within 36 months after the effective date of this Act. Provides that the interns shall be placed in communities so as to increase access to behavioral health services for patients residing in rural and underserved areas of this State; and (3) beginning July 1, 2020, develop 5 behavioral health interdisciplinary training sites each year until a total of 20 sites have been developed. Provides that 10 of the 20 sites shall be in counties with a population of fewer than 50,000 inhabitants. Requires the Center to perform other duties. Provides that no later than December 1 of every odd-numbered year, the Center shall prepare a report of its activities under the Behavioral Health Workforce Act. Provides that the report shall be filed electronically with the General Assembly and shall be provided electronically to any member of the General Assembly upon request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BEHAVIORAL HLTH WORKFORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback