IL HB5111 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Behavioral Health Workforce Act. Creates the Behavioral Health Education Center, administered by a teaching or research State university, or both. Provides that the Center shall be operational on or before July 1, 2019. Provides that the Center shall: (1) provide funds for 2 additional medical residents in a State-based psychiatry program each year beginning July 1, 2019 until a total of 8 additional psychiatry residents are added in 2022; (2) provide funds for 5 one-year doctoral-level psychology internships, master social workers, and master level clinical professional counselors in this State within 12 months after the effective date of this Act and every year thereafter and increase the number of interns in the program to 10 within 36 months after the effective date of this Act. Provides that the interns shall be placed in communities so as to increase access to behavioral health services for patients residing in rural and underserved areas of this State; and (3) beginning July 1, 2020, develop 5 behavioral health interdisciplinary training sites each year until a total of 20 sites have been developed. Provides that 10 of the 20 sites shall be in counties with a population of fewer than 50,000 inhabitants. Requires the Center to perform other duties. Provides that no later than December 1 of every odd-numbered year, the Center shall prepare a report of its activities under the Behavioral Health Workforce Act. Provides that the report shall be filed electronically with the General Assembly and shall be provided electronically to any member of the General Assembly upon request.
Title
BEHAVIORAL HLTH WORKFORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0767 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |