IL HB5104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Deletes provision that the Department of Corrections shall require the committed person receiving medical or dental services on a non-emergency basis to pay a $5 co-payment to the Department for each visit for medical or dental services. Provides that if a Department facility maintains a commissary or commissaries serving inmates, the selling prices for all goods shall be sufficient to cover the costs of the goods and an additional charge of up to 10% (rather than 35% for tobacco products and up to 25% for non-tobacco products). Deletes provisions that the Department shall notify the Attorney General of the existence of any proceeds which it believes should be applied towards a satisfaction, in whole or in part, of the person's incarceration costs. Deletes provision that of the compensation earned for work assignments, a portion, as determined by the Department, shall be used to offset the cost of the committed person's incarceration.
Title
CD CORR-INMATE CO-PAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 15, 2018 |
2018-11-14 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-020-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-19 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-17 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 004-001-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-12-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-12-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-7-2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |