IL HB5104 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governor Succession Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the line of succession for the office of Governor.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 65 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2016-11-16 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Lost 065-041-000 |
2016-11-16 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-15 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2016-08-26 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-018-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 010-005-000 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-037-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 014-005-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | Re-assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |