IL HB5099 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person may use a wireless telephone while operating a motor vehicle within 500 feet of an emergency scene except for specified purposes. Adds digital photographs and video to the definition of "electronic message" in provisions prohibiting the use of electronic communication devices while operating a motor vehicle. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-ACCIDENTS:NO CELL PHNES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 84 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0828 |
2012-07-20 | House | Effective Date July 20, 2012 |
2012-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 084-030-000 |
2012-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Held in Criminal Law |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 22, 2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-038-000 |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-08 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-610.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-610.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |