IL HB5097 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall not prohibit a person from receiving a license solely because the person is not a citizen of the United States. Provides that the Department may grant a license to a person who satisfies specific requirements regarding immigration status and fulfills other necessary requirements to obtain a license. Effective immediately.
Title
DFPR LICENSE-NON-CITIZENS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-004-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2105 | 2105-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5097&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5097.htm |