IL HB5096 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, every public high school shall include in its curriculum a unit of instruction on media literacy; defines "media literacy". Provides requirements for the unit of instruction. Provides that the State Superintendent of Education may prepare and make available to school boards instructional materials that may be used as guidelines for the unit of instruction. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MEDIA LITERACY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-20.08New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback