IL HB5094 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Workforce Direct Care Act. Establishes the Behavioral Health Administrative Burden Work Group within the Office of the Chief Behavioral Health Officer. Sets forth membership and responsibilities of the Work Group, including to review policies and regulations affecting the behavioral health industry to identify inefficiencies, duplicate or unnecessary requirements, unduly burdensome restrictions, and other administrative barriers that prevent behavioral health professionals from providing services and to analyze the impact of administrative burdensome the delivery of quality care and access to behavioral health services. Requires the Work Group to meet at least once a month and to prepare an administrative burden reduction plan with policy recommendations to improve access to behavioral health care.
Title
DIRECT CARE EXPANSION ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 006-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 017-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 020-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |