IL HB5085 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Removes changes to provisions concerning the EMT Training, Recruitment, and Retention Task Force; Emergency Medical Services personnel licensure levels; and vehicle service providers. Removes language providing that an education plan within a resource hospital may include classes performed outside of the region in which the resource hospital is located. Provides that an EMS System may coordinate education outside of the region of which it is located with valid justification and Department of Public Health approval. Provides that the didactic portion of education may be conducted through an online platform with EMS System and Department approval. Sets forth provisions concerning Department approval. Provides that an EMS Lead Instructor may oversee a paramedic with at least 3 years of experience to teach EMT classes, with a licensed teacher, in high schools. Provides that high school students electing to not take the National Registry of Emergency Medical Technicians (NREMT) Certification exam shall not be accounted for in calculating the course pass rate by the EMS System or Department.
Title
EMS ACT TRAINING & CURRICULUM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |