IL HB5084 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. In the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code, permits the Department of Human Services to purchase incarceration data through a third-party resource to conduct data matches of incarcerated individuals.
Title
DHS-PUB AID ELIGIBILITY REVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b | Amended Code | Citation Text |