IL HB5081 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Deletes a provision requiring the Department on Aging to make a grant to an institution of higher learning to study the feasibility of establishing and implementing an affirmative action employment plan for the recruitment, hiring, training, and retraining of persons 60 or more years old. In provisions authorizing the Department to make eligibility determinations for benefits administered by other governmental bodies based on the income eligibility limitation in the Senior Citizens and Persons with Disabilities Property Tax Relief Act, specifies a particular location in that Act. Provides that the Director of Aging shall receive an annual salary as set by the Compensation Review Board. Repeals a provision requiring the Director to give a bond of not less than $10,000 conditioned for the faithful performance of his or her duties. Amends the Property Tax Code. Deletes a provision requiring counties to include in property tax bills information that taxpayers may be eligible for benefits under the Senior Citizens and Persons with Disabilities Property Tax Relief Act and that applications are available from the Department on Aging. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
ACT ON THE AGING-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 4.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 6.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 6.04 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 20-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5081&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5081.htm |