IL HB5077 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if a minor is committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice, the clerk of the court shall forward to the Department the sentencing order and copies of committing petition and an accurate reporting of the minor's criminal history in a manner and form prescribed by the Department of Juvenile Justice. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-COMMITMENT REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-750Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback