IL HB5077 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if a minor is committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice, the clerk of the court shall forward to the Department the sentencing order and copies of committing petition and an accurate reporting of the minor's criminal history in a manner and form prescribed by the Department of Juvenile Justice. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CT-COMMITMENT REPORTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0765 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |